This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/21/2021 at 19:15:46 (UTC).

COBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST -v- HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 COBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Halgrimson, Carrie. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1258

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Halgrimson, Carrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST

Defendant

HERNANDEZ, RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

07/22/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

07/22/2021: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

06/22/2021: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed

06/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

06/22/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

06/22/2021: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

06/22/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialCOBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0017347; JOHN E BOUZANE; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialCOBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: COBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST; Awarded Against: HERNANDEZ, RAMON; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $2,860.00; Costs: $276.25; Other: $2,770.81; Other Comment: INTEREST; Total: $5,907.06; Party; Names; COBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST; HERNANDEZ, RAMON; Comment; Comment: (6/22/21 RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialCOBRA 28 NO 2 LP AND /OR ITS SUCCESSORS AND/OR ASSIGNEES IN INTEREST; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF DEATH OF TIMOTHY B LIEBAERT & DECLARATION OF HG LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.