This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 17:14:45 (UTC).

City of Rancho Cucamonga -v- Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 City of Rancho Cucamonga filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Alvarez, Donald and Donald Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7516

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Alvarez, Donald

Donald Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Rancho Cucamonga

a municipal corporation

Not Yet Classified and Defendants

a California corporation

DOES 1 through 200, inclusive

Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc.

RJM Design Group, Inc.

Roes 1 through 30

Mack P and S Construction Incorporated

Mack P&S Construction, Inc.

Roes 2 through 100, Inclusive

MACK P&S CONSTRUCTION INC.

Moes 1 to 100

Concrete Building Systems Construction Co., Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richards Watson & Gershon APC

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Messner Reeves LLP

Murtaugh Treglia Stern & Deily LLP

Other Attorneys

Law Offices of John A Hauser

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Miscellaneous Document Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued on

* Public *

Cross-Complaint Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Cross-Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued on

* Public *

Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of

Notice

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

* Public *

Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:

* Public *

Summons Issued on

* Public *

Cross-Complaint Filed

* Public *

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2023

HearingType: Further Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S23 - SBJC; Judge: Alvarez, Donald

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

HearingType: Further Trial Setting Conference: Mediation Completion; Department: Department S23 - SBJC; Judge: Alvarez, Donald; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Conformed Copies in the Attorney Bin - No Envelope Provided; Comments: signed Stipulation re: Continuance of Post-Mediation Status and Trial Setting Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Stipulation & Order filed; Comments: re: Continuance of Post-Mediation Status and Trial Setting Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1890.00; Payment: $1455.00; Credit: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-33949

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022
View Court Documents

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S23 - SBJC; Judge: Alvarez, Donald; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice Filed; Comments: notice of hearing on OSC status of mediation and continued ITSC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Demand for Jury Trial Filed; Filed By: RJM Design Group, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
11/03/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: City of Rancho Cucamonga; Comments: filed by plaintiff City of Rancho Cucamonga filed 11/3/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 09/28/2021 complaint filed by plaintiff City of Rancho Cucamonga

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: City of Rancho Cucamonga; Comments: filed by plaintiff City of Rancho Cucamonga filed 9/28/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

DocketFile Type: Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5; Filed By: City of Rancho Cucamonga

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: City of Rancho Cucamonga; Comments: Certificate of Merit filed by plaintiff City of Rancho Cucamonga

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less