This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 18:15:54 (UTC).

City of Rancho Cucamonga -v- THM Enterprises, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 City of Rancho Cucamonga filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against THM Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5208

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Rancho Cucamonga

a Municipal Corporation

Defendants

THM Enterprises, LLC

Topete, Jorge Joel

Topete, Estelle B

Sears Mortgage Corporation

Evertrust Bank

Marp Investments, LLC

Meadows Bank

YTC Investments, LLC

Fredrickson Enterprises, Inc

Any and All Persons Unknown Having or Claiming to have Any Title or Interest in or to the Property Sought to be Condemed Herin

Does 1-100

Any and All Persons Unknown

Having or Claiming to have Any Title or Interest in or to the Property Sought to be Condemed Herin

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS, WATSON & GERSHON

Attorney at RICHARDS, WATSON & GERSHON

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

07/06/2021: Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed

Motion re:

07/02/2021: Motion re:

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

07/02/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

06/16/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

06/07/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

05/27/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Certificate of Assignment Received

05/27/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

05/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Complaint Filed

05/27/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Ochoa, Gilbert; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: order of possession filed by pla city of rancho on 07/02/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialCity of Rancho Cucamonga; Governmental Waiver; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialCity of Rancho Cucamonga; Transaction Assessment; $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed; Comment: Naming Doe 1 as JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketGovernment Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5; Comment: court reporter/motion fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion re:; Comment: order of possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: without

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketGovernment Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5; Comment: lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialCity of Rancho Cucamonga; Governmental Waiver; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • FinancialCity of Rancho Cucamonga; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialCity of Rancho Cucamonga; Total Financial Assessment: $525.00; Total Payments and Credits: $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketGovernment Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EVERTRUST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where a municipal corporation and a chartered city is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant