This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 07:39:12 (UTC).

City of Needles -v- Virgina Andrus et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 City of Needles filed an Other lawsuit against Virgina Andrus. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7046

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Petitioners

City of Needles

A Charter City

Respondents

Andrus, Virginia B

Does 1 through 10

Owner

Not Yet Classified

Adams, Mark S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

Slovak Baron Empey Murphy & Pinkney LLP

Attorney at Slovak Baron Empey Murphy & Pinkney LLP

Adams, Mark Samuel

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Adams, Mark Samuel

 

Court Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/03/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/03/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Report Filed

11/23/2021: Report Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

10/05/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

10/05/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

10/05/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

10/05/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Motion re:

08/17/2021: Motion re:

Proof of Service Filed

07/12/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Notice Filed

07/12/2021: Notice Filed

Proof of Service

06/30/2021: Proof of Service

Notice Filed

06/30/2021: Notice Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

06/23/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Proof of Service Filed

06/18/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Notice of Ruling Filed

06/18/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

Order Filed Re:

06/15/2021: Order Filed Re:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

06/11/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

05/26/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: for order to confirm sale of receivership property filed by receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport Filed; Comment: of receiver *SECOND* and declaration of Thomas Yatteau; filed by Court-Appointed Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: August, 2021 monthly accounting of receivership income, expenses and interim fees; (proposed) order; filed by Mark S. Adams Court-Appointed Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: July, 2021 monthly accounting of receivership income, expenses and interim fees; (proposed) order; filed by Mark S. Adams Court-Appointed Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: June, 2021 monthly accounting of receivership income, expenses and interim fees; filed by Mark S. Adams Court-Appointed Receiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion for Order to Confirm Sale of Receivership Property. Filed by Receiver Mark S. Adams on 08/17/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketArbitration - Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialAdams, Mark S; Total Financial Assessment: $167.00; Total Payments and Credits: $167.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • FinancialCity of Needles; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent; Comment: by Court of Status of Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: summons names on summons do not match names on petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPoints and Authorities Filed; Comment: in supp of petition for appointment of receiver & other relief pursuant to ca health & safety code section 17980.7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of mark adams in supp of petition for appointment of a receiver pursuant to health & safety code section 17980.7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: of adrian chavez in supp of petition for appointment of a receiver pursuant to health & safety code section 17980.7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition Filed (Civil); Comment: for appointment of a receiver re real property in Needles

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a charter city is a litigant

Latest cases where OWNER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS MARK SAMUEL