This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 23:04:11 (UTC).

Cashcall-v-Shockey

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Cashcall-v-Shockey was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald J Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7668

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald J Gilbert

 

Party Details

Defendant

Shockey, Timothy

Assignees

WAHR Financial Group, LLC

A Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENOSIAN & MIELE, LLP

 

Court Documents

Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied

* Public *

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino

* Public *

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

* Public *

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

* Public *

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

* Public *

Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $85.00; Payment: $85.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $40.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-12377

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $40.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino; Filed By: WAHR Financial Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comments: 0.00/0.00/119.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: WAHR Financial Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $45.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-37594

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $45.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: WAHR Financial Group, LLC; Comments: $45 Check for ROJ fee paid by Assignee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Renewal of Judgment; Type: Action; Description: Original Judgment entered 12/01/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed; Filed By: WAHR Financial Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Filed By: WAHR Financial Group, LLC; Comments: 2825.00/1516.37/571.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:; Comments: SMCCS1100635

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAHR FINANCIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant