This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 09:04:16 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC -v- WOODALL

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOODALL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1788

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

WOODALL, YVONNE

Not Yet Classified

SUNLAN LDP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF KENOSIAN & MIELE LLP

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENOSIAN & MIELE LLP

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

06/01/2021: Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

06/01/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

06/01/2021: Memoradum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

08/23/2021: Proof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

08/23/2021: Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: PSRJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialCASHCALL INC; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0017777; CASHCALL INC; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • FinancialCASHCALL INC; Transaction Assessment; $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Renewal of Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CASHCALL INC; Awarded Against: WOODALL, YVONNE; Amount; Costs: $45.00; Other: $4,515.98; Other Comment: PRINCIPAL JUDGMENT; Total: $4560.98; Party; Names; CASHCALL INC; WOODALL, YVONNE; SUNLAN LDP, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Comment; Comment: (06/01/2021 RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialCASHCALL INC; Total Financial Assessment: $45.00; Total Payments and Credits: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: INTEREST OF: $1875.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNLAN LDP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant