This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 03:09:35 (UTC).

Brown -v - Knight Sunrise Fontana, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 Brown -v - Knight Sunrise Fontana, LLC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian S McCarville and McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9366

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brian S McCarville

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, Scott D

Defendants

Knight Sunrise Fontana, LLC

Developers Surety and Indemnity Company

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L. STARR, APC

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S30 - SBJC; Judge: McCarville, Brian S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Scott Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-29929

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Scott Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 04/24/2023 complaint filed by plaintiff Scott D. Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Scott Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration Filed; Filed By: Scott Brown; Comments: Declaration of Robert L. Starr Regarding Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Scott Brown; Comments: $435 paid on 4/25/23 for new filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less