This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/19/2023 at 03:53:24 (UTC).

The Huntington National Bank -v- Blackwell et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 The Huntington National Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blackwell. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian S McCarville and McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4662

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brian S McCarville

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Huntington National Bank

Defendants

The Testate and Intestate Successors of Raymond D. Rail

Blackwell, Andrew

DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH DECEDENT

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S30 - SBJC; Judge: McCarville, Brian S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $380.00; Payment: $380.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $380.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-27345

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $380.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: The Huntington National Bank; Comments: filed by plaintiff The Huntington National Bank 4/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 2/6/2023 complaint filed by plaintiff The Huntington National Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: The Huntington National Bank; Comments: $380.00 check paid on 4/18/2023 for filing fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: The Huntington National Bank; Comments: filed by plaintiff The Huntington National Bank; filed against defendant Andrew Blackwell, et al. on complaint 2/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less