This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/15/2023 at 03:03:12 (UTC).

Chavez, Sr. et al -v- First Student, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 Chavez, Sr filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against First Student, Inc. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are John M Pacheco and Pacheco, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1181

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

John M Pacheco

Pacheco, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chavez, Sr., Benjamin

Chavez, Kristina

INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF BENJAMIN TROY CHAVEZ. DECEASED;

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF BENJAMIN TROY CHAVEZ, DECEASED;

INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF BENJAMIN TROY CHAVEZ.; DECEASED

Defendants

First Student, Inc

Does 1-25

A DELWARE CORPORATION

Mundo, Alejandro

INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM,PLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/05/2024

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S31 - SBJC; Judge: Pacheco, John M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr., Kristina Chavez, Kristina Chavez

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $585.00; Payment: $585.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-70277

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketFile Type: Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr.; Comments: $150 visa paid on 9/12/23 for jury fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketFile Type: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 09.07.23 Complaint filed by Benjamin Chavez, Sr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-69316

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Benjamin Chavez, Sr., Kristina Chavez, Kristina Chavez

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM,PLC, Benjamin Chavez, Sr., Kristina Chavez, Kristina Chavez; Comments: $435.00 chk paid 1st app fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less