This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/26/2023 at 07:34:18 (UTC).

Foundation Pile, INC -v - Swinerton Builders et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Foundation Pile, INC -v - Swinerton Builders was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S Garza and Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4336

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas S Garza

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Foundation Pile, INC

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

Swinerton Builders

Dignity Health

Commonspirit Health

DOES 1 through 30

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

(MERGED INTO COMMONSPIRIT HEALTH, A NON

PROFIT CORPORATION )

A NON

PROFIT CORPORATION

INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rice, Mark John

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Notice of Required Documents Sent

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2023

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S27 - SBJC; Judge: Garza, Thomas S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-29256

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Required Documents Sent; Filed By: Mark Rice; Comments: Please Submit Certificate of Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 01/31/2023 complaint filed by Foundation Pile, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Foundation Pile, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Foundation Pile, INC; Comments: $435.00 check paid on 4/24/2023 for first appearance fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less