This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 06:33:34 (UTC).

Abraham et al -v- City of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2023 Abraham filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ochoa, Gilbert and Gilbert Ochoa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5202

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ochoa, Gilbert

Gilbert Ochoa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Abraham, Tiffany

INDIVIDUALLY

Estate of Cristofer James Abraham Martin

Abraham, Cali

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF CRISTIFOR JAMES ABRAHAM MARTIN

AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST OF CRISTOFER JAMES ABRAHAM MARTIN

Defendants

City of Los Angeles

Los Angeles World Airports

Champion Fire Systems, Inc

Communication Technology Services, LLC

Communication Technology Services, Inc.

New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC

At&T Mobility Corporation

T-Mobile West Tower LLC

T-Mobile West LLC

Sprint PCS Assets, LLC

Los Angeles SMSA Limited Partnership

DOES 1-100

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aitken Aitken Cohn

Defendant Attorneys

Glynn, Finley, Mortl Hanlon & Friedenberg, LLP

Thomas Lucas

SEKI, NISHIMURA & WATASE, LLP

PERKINS COIE LLP

 

Court Documents

Court Order Filed

Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice of Remote Appearance

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

84643Noticeof00ac447

* Public *

Ex Parte Application

* Public *

2023-10-12_Not of Remote Appearance_fnl.pdf

* Public *

231011 Ntc of Lien (Travelers).pdf

* Public *

Motion Filed Re:

Motion

Motion re:

* Public *

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

* Public *

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

* Public *

REJ - Notice of Returning Documents

* Public *

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2024

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2024

HearingType: Predisposition Motion re:: Motion by defendnat City of Los Angeles to change venue to Los Angeles County.; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $5570.00; Payment: $4520.00; Credit: $1050.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $20.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-79331

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $20.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2023

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Tiffany Abraham; Comments: $20.00 ch paid on 11/7/23 for stip fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

HearingType: Ex Parte Hearing - Predisposition: TO ADVANCE THE HEARING ON ITS MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert; Result: Not Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Filed By: PERKINS COIE LLP, SEKI, NISHIMURA & WATASE, LLP, Aitken Aitken Cohn, Thomas Lucas, Glynn, Finley, Mortl Hanlon & Friedenberg, LLP; Comments: Minute Order & Ruling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed By: Tiffany Abraham

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Court Order Filed; Comments: Ruling on Exparte

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:; Filed By: Cali Abraham; Comments: Tiffany Abraham

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:; Filed By: Cash Abraham; Comments: Tiffany Abraham

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 07/06/23 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tiffany Abraham

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2023-52961

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Tiffany Abraham, Cali Abraham, Cash Abraham, Estate of Cristofer James Abraham Martin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Tiffany Abraham; Comments: $435.00 paid by ch for First Appearance Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less