This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 18:09:44 (UTC).

BURMESTER -v- MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 BURMESTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ortiz, Joseph T, Halgrimson, Carrie and Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1132

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ortiz, Joseph T

Halgrimson, Carrie

Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURMESTER, KATIA

Defendants

MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC

HANH NGUYEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

07/02/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

Authorization to Appear Filed

07/02/2021: Authorization to Appear Filed

**SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

07/02/2021: **SCLLT - Portal Minute Order

SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

07/02/2021: SCLLT - Cert. of Electronic Recording Monitor Form

Ex Parte Correspondence Return Notice

06/04/2021: Ex Parte Correspondence Return Notice

Clerk's Notice of Hearing

05/25/2021: Clerk's Notice of Hearing

Clerk's Notice of Hearing

05/25/2021: Clerk's Notice of Hearing

Proof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

05/11/2021: Proof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

05/04/2021: Claim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/04/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

Notice for Small Claims Hearing

05/04/2021: Notice for Small Claims Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garcia-Rodrigo, Candice; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - After Hearing (Uncontested); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC; Awarded Against: BURMESTER, KATIA; Party; Comment; Comment: (On Plaintiff's Claim, judgment for Defendant entered on 07/02/2021.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed and Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Electronic Recording Monitor Printed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCourt Trial proceeds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Hearing; Judicial Officer: Halgrimson, Carrie; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $2500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Correspondence Received And Returned Not Read

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: REQ. DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Certified Mail as to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDocument Received; Comment: POS-CERT MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialBURMESTER, KATIA; Mail Payment; Receipt # FO-2021-0011160; BURMESTER, KATIA; $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialBURMESTER, KATIA; Transaction Assessment; $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialBURMESTER, KATIA; Transaction Assessment; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Service by Certified Mail to:; Comment: TRACKING# 7013 1710 0001 7638 8667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • FinancialBURMESTER, KATIA; Total Financial Assessment: $65.00; Total Payments and Credits: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff >$1,500 <$5,000 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAZDA MOTOR OF AMERICA, INC. is a litigant