This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 00:08:57 (UTC).

Brown & Goodkin -v- Brand, Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Brown Goodkin filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Brand, Jr. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ochoa, Gilbert, Frangie, Janet M and Gilbert Ochoa. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6900

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ochoa, Gilbert

Frangie, Janet M

Gilbert Ochoa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brown & Goodkin

An Association of Law Corporations

Defendants

DOES 1-10

Brand, Rodney

Brand Jr., Rodney

INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Klaskin, Harold Charles

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted

* Public *

Notice Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service Filed

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

Order

Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed

* Public *

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin; Comments: filed by pla Brown & Goodkin without prejudice against all defs on complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert; Result: Not Held; Court Reporter: Austin, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M; Result: Cancelled - Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S24 - SBJC; Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert; Result: Not Held; Court Reporter: Austin, Stephanie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Filed By: Harold Klaskin; Comments: Copy of Minute Order and Initial Trial Setting Order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice Filed; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin; Comments: Notice of Conditional Settlement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $870.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Credit; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2021-18114

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 2/23/21 complaint filed by Brown & Goodkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin; Comments: $435 check paid on 4/8/21 for new filing fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Brown & Goodkin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less