This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 05:04:01 (UTC).

Brown et al -v- Gonzales Garcia et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gonzales Garcia. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sachs, Michael A and Michael A Sachs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8336

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sachs, Michael A

Michael A Sachs

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brown, Ruth Phyllis

Brown, Katelyn Renee

Defendants

Does 1-50

County of San Bernardino

State of California, Department of Transportation

State of California

Southern California Edison Company

Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc.

INCLUSIVE

City of Rialto

Department of State Hospitals - Patton

Gonzales Garcia, Betzareli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL & LAZARUS

Attorney at RUSSELL & LAZARUS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S28 - SBJC; Judge: Sachs, Michael A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $585.00; Payment: $585.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-65465

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Katelyn Brown; Comments: $150.00 ck paid on 11/7/22 for jury fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed; Filed By: Katelyn Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 09/27/2022 Complaint filed by Katelyn Renee Brown and Ruth Phyllis Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-56663

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Katelyn Brown, Ruth Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: Katelyn Brown, Ruth Brown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where inclusive is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF STATE HOSPITALS (DSH) is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant