This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 06:23:51 (UTC).

Billings et al -v- City of Hesperiaet al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Billings filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Hesperia. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apaloo, Khymberli S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7323

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Apaloo, Khymberli S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Orellana, Corina

Billings, Michele

Defendants

Auto Club Enterprises

Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club

City of Hesperia

Farmers Insurance Exchange

DOES 1-50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MUHAREB LAW GROUP

Attorney at MUHAREB LAW GROUP

Wynder Law, Inc

Attorney at Wynder Law, Inc

Defendant Attorneys

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OFSOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

Bordin Semmer LLP

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

Messner Reeves LLP

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

 

Court Documents

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

06/17/2021: Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

Declaration re:

06/17/2021: Declaration re:

Answer Filed

06/16/2021: Answer Filed

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

06/01/2021: Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

Answer Filed

06/01/2021: Answer Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

04/12/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

03/05/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

03/05/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

03/05/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

Complaint Filed

03/05/2021: Complaint Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialInterinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Counter Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-37959; Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • FinancialInterinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check paid on 06/25/21 for first appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketBalance Paid on Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialFarmers Insurance Exchange; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-36881; Farmers Insurance Exchange; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialFarmers Insurance Exchange; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketBalance Due on Case; Comment: First app fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fees Due to the Court on or Before

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: Good faith Attempt to meet and confer

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialFarmers Insurance Exchange; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialInterinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialCity of Hesperia; Total Financial Assessment: $585.00; Total Payments and Credits: $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialBillings, Michele; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $435.00 check paid on 4/12/2021 for first appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTO CLUB ENTERPRISES GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant