This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 22:43:39 (UTC).

Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc et al -v- Sun et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Sun. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet M Frangie and Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2251

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Janet M Frangie

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc

A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Zeming Qi

Defendants

DOES 1-50

Sun, Yuan

Yao, Hong

Jin, Jun

INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gross, Kenneth I.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:; Filed By: Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $446.50; Payment: $446.50; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $11.50; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-42468

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $11.50; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Hong Yao; Comments: $11.50 credit card paid on 07/19/22 for copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-39822

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 06/15/2022 complaint filed by plaintiff Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc, Zeming Qi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Alkvisual Led Display Solutions, Inc; Comments: $435.00 paid by check on 07/05/2022 for new filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where inclusive is a litigant

Latest cases where A CALIFORNIA LIMITED CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSS KENNETH I. ESQ.