This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 03:03:12 (UTC).

Alescio -v- City of Ontario et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 Alescio filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Ontario. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sachs, Michael A and Michael A Sachs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2343

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sachs, Michael A

Michael A Sachs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alescio, Barbara

Defendants

City of Ontario

a government entity

Does 1 through 100

Not Yet Classified

Beta Healthcare Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Custodio & Dubey LLP

Attorney at Custodio & Dubey LLP

Defendant Attorney

McCune & Harber LLP

Attorney at McCune & Harber LLP

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Laughlin, Falbo, Levy & Moresi LLP

Attorney at Laughlin, Falbo, Levy & Moresi LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Summons Issued and Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Miscellaneous Document Filed

* Public *

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed

* Public *

Answer Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed

* Public *

**CV - Portal Minute Order

**Portal Minute Order

Notice of Ruling Filed

* Public *

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingType: Jury Trial; Department: Department S28 - SBJC; Judge: Sachs, Michael A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Readiness Conference; Department: Department S28 - SBJC; Judge: Sachs, Michael A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Ruling Filed; Filed By: Barbara Alescio; Comments: Re: Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S28 - SBJC; Judge: Sachs, Michael A; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Filed By: City of Ontario

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $1020.00; Payment: $1020.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $150.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-37312

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $150.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed; Filed By: Barbara Alescio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: City of Ontario; Comments: $150.00 check paid on 6/21/2022 for Advance Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Document Filed; Filed By: Beta Healthcare Group; Comments: Notrice of and Application for Lien; filed by Other Party Beta Healthcare on 1/12/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Payment; Charges: $0.00; Payment: $435.00; Credit: $0.00; Receipt Number: SC-2022-00322

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comments: Filed by plaintiff Barbara Alescio filed 01/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 11/12/2021 Complaint filed by Barbara Alescio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Barbara Alescio; Comments: Filed by plaintiff Barbara Alescio. Filed against defendant City of Ontario, and Does 1 through 100 on complaint filed 11/12/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFile Type: Filing Fee Paid by; Filed By: Barbara Alescio; Comments: $435.00 check paid on 01/04/2022 for First Appearance fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less