This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/01/2022 at 15:08:24 (UTC).

Acosta -v- City of San Bernardino et al

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Acosta filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against City of San Bernardino. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet M Frangie and Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1445

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Janet M Frangie

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acosta, Artemio

Defendants

City of San Bernardino

DOES 1-20

 

Court Documents

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

* Public *

Complaint Filed

* Public *

Certificate of Assignment Received

* Public *

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

* Public *

Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement printed

* Public *

Notice of Hearing Sent

* Public *

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

* Public *

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

* Public *

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2022

HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Department: Department S29 - SBJC; Judge: Frangie, Janet M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Total; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022

FinancialTransaction Type: Charge; Charges: $435.00; Payment: $0.00; Credit: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022

DocketFile Type: Balance Due on Case; Filed By: Artemio Acosta; Comments: $435.00 for filing fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before; Filed By: Artemio Acosta

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Filed By: Artemio Acosta; Comments: Summons; defendant listed on Complaint does not match Summons(missing DOES 1-20); Request to Waive Court fees,Question 5b checked, please complete section 7,8,9 as directed in instructions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Hearing Sent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Complaint; Type: Action; Description: 03/01/2022 complaint filed by plaintiff Artemio Acosta

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint Filed; Filed By: Artemio Acosta; Comments: filed by plaintiff Artemio Acosta filed 3/1/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Certificate of Assignment Received

[+] Read More [-] Read Less