This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/26/2022 at 01:57:05 (UTC).

** Complex-Class Action** Carrillo-V-Blusky Restoration Contractors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Complex-Class Action Carrillo-V-Blusky Restoration Contractors LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cohn, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5793

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cohn, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrillo, Santos

Defendants

Blusky Restoration Contractors LLC

a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Does 1-20

Har-Bro, LLC

Har-Bro, Inc

Does 3-20

a California Limited Liability Company

a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAUBY MANKIN & LAUBY, LLP

Attorney at LAUBY MANKIN & LAUBY, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Fisher & Phillips LLC

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLC

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

Attorney at FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

 

Court Documents

Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

01/10/2022: Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/10/2022: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

01/04/2022: Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

07/21/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice Returning Documents

07/21/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/10/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/10/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

01/10/2022: Court's Notice of Continuance - Civil

Stipulation & Order filed

06/15/2021: Stipulation & Order filed

General Appearance Filed

06/11/2021: General Appearance Filed

Notice Returning Documents

06/04/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Amended Summons Issued and Filed

06/04/2021: Amended Summons Issued and Filed

Miscellaneous Document Filed

05/28/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Amended Document Filed re:

05/28/2021: Amended Document Filed re:

Amended Complaint Filed

05/28/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/02/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Order Re: Filed

04/02/2021: Order Re: Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

02/11/2021: Certificate of Assignment Received

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Cohn, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Fees of $20.00 required for request to continue along with order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Conference Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: A POS-012 must be filed with POS-010 Proof of Service. Please resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order filed; Comment: To Continue Initial Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialBlusky Restoration Contractors LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-35449; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc.; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialBlusky Restoration Contractors LLC; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • FinancialBlusky Restoration Contractors LLC; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-35448; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialCarrillo, Santos; Transaction Assessment; $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialCarrillo, Santos; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-15367; Carrillo, Santos; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • FinancialCarrillo, Santos; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialBlusky Restoration Contractors LLC; Total Financial Assessment: $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialCarrillo, Santos; Total Financial Assessment: $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $1435.00 Check paid on 3/25/21 for Complex and new filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAR-BRO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ,a Delware Limited Liability Company is a litigant