This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/12/2021 at 19:04:40 (UTC).

ZIXI WANG -N- YUAN LI

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 ZIXI WANG -N- YUAN LI was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4079

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ZIXI WANG

Respondent

YUAN LI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

XU, HANZHANG

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAction Text: VACATE SJD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/30/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketAction Text: FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/06/2020 OF ZIXI WANG FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/06/2020 OF ZIXI WANG ORDERED ENTERED 12/02/20; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAction Text: ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/06/2020 OF ZIXI WANG FOR YUAN LI, ATTORNEY PRO/PER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAction Text: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON YUAN LI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAction Text: APPEARANCE STIPULATION WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAction Text: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAction Text: RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/06/2020 OF ZIXI WANG BY YUAN LI FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.; Minutes; Receipt: 201125-0060 $435.00; 201125-0060-CK Reference Number 1011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAction Text: JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAction Text: NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; YOUR JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S) ON FORM FL-130, RESPONDENTS; INFORMATION NEEDS TO BE ON THE TOP OF THE FORM SINCE THEY ARE THE ONES WISHING TO APPEAR WITH; THIS FORM. PLEASE REVISE AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAction Text: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAction Text: STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAction Text: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ZIXI WANG FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAction Text: DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY YUAN LI FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAction Text: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAction Text: FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAction Text: FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 200708-0412 $435.00; 200708-0412-CK Reference Number 1004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAction Text: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer XU HANZHANG