This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 20:46:59 (UTC).

ZHAO-V-REPET ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 ZHAO-V-REPET was filed as an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr., Williams, David A and Pacheco, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2473

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

Williams, David A

Pacheco, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified

ZHAO, SHUBIN "VINCENT"

Not Yet Classified

REPET, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZHAO, SHUBIN "VINCENT"

REPET GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REPET GROUP USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMCP INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LI, LUCY

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH

CALDARELLI HEJMANOWSKI PAGE & LEER LLP

Neach, Brian

Preovolos Lewin & Hezlep, ALC

 

Court Documents

Stipulation Filed re:

01/15/2021: Stipulation Filed re:

Order After Hearing Filed

01/13/2021: Order After Hearing Filed

Order After Hearing Filed

01/13/2021: Order After Hearing Filed

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/13/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/13/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Proof of Service Filed

12/02/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Motion re:

11/12/2020: Motion re:

Motion re:

11/12/2020: Motion re:

Points and Authorities Filed

11/12/2020: Points and Authorities Filed

Declaration Filed

11/12/2020: Declaration Filed

Motion re:

11/12/2020: Motion re:

Motion re:

11/12/2020: Motion re:

Points and Authorities Filed

11/12/2020: Points and Authorities Filed

Declaration Filed

11/12/2020: Declaration Filed

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

11/06/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

10/29/2020: RULING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE DOCUMENT LIST BY OVERNIGHT

10/23/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE DOCUMENT LIST BY OVERNIGHT

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRIAN J KENNEDY ISO MS

10/23/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRIAN J KENNEDY ISO MS

296 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2021

DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2021

DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2021

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2021
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation Filed re:; Comment: to Continue Trial Dates

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOrder After Hearing Filed; Comment: Reserving Motion Ruling on Issue of Sanctions Against S. Zhao

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOrder After Hearing Filed; Comment: re: Order Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts in Requess for Admissions re: Zhao

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021

DocketComment:; Comment: Vol 14 returned to doc control for file back

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Issue Sanctions Against Cross-Defendant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Deeming Admitted Truth of Facts in Requests for Admission

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
647 More Docket Entries
02/10/2017

FinancialREPET GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment: $5.00; Total Payments and Credits: $5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017

FinancialREPET, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment: $170.00; Total Payments and Credits: $170.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017

DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY SHUBIN "VINCENT" ZHAO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE 170210-0822-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 170210-0822-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 113232

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2017

DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF SHUBIN "VINCENT" ZHAO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less