This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/10/2018 at 01:59:10 (UTC).

ZENDEJAS VS VANHOLLAND

Case Summary

On 01/28/2011 ZENDEJAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VANHOLLAND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS

Defendant

EVALENA VANHOLLAND

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110131-4230 $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EVALENA VANHOLLAND; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/11 WITH COSTS OF $10.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EVALENA VANHOLLAND; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/11 WITH COSTS OF $10.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: I WILLIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS PRESENT; YURIRIA SOLIS HAS TAKEN THE OATH TO INTERPRET SPANISH INTO ENGLISH AND ENGLISH INTO SPANISH.; DEFENDANT EVALENA VANHOLLAND PRESENT; DEFENDANTS DAUGHTER MEREDITH CRAIG ASSISTING DEFENDANT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; 10:30; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; PLAINTIFF DRAWS A DIAGRAM; WITNESS -- EVALENA VANHOLLAND IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; KAREN OHARA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/28/2011 OF MARISOL ZENDEJAS ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/11; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT EVALENA VANHOLLAND; AND AGAINST MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/30/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO EVALENA VANHOLLAND; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/11 WITH COSTS OF $10.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS FOR S; Minutes; Receipt: 110131-4313 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARISOL SUMUANO ZENDEJAS FOR CERTIFIED MAIL; Minutes; Receipt: 110131-4236 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110131-4230 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less