This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2021 at 13:23:56 (UTC).

YUMUL -VS- OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2015 YUMUL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1752

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DINA LOMBOS YUMUL

YUMUL, DINA LOMBOS

Defendants

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING

U.S. BANCORP

U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR THE MASTR ADJUSTABLE RATE

Not Classified By Court

CENLAR FSB

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADVOCATE LEGAL

5455 Wilshire Blvd Suite 2119

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

HOUSER & ALLISON

9920 Pacific Heights Blvd Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92121

Law Offices of Houser & Allison

Attorney at Law Offices of Houser & Allison

PARTRIDGE, WILLIAM L

4375 Jutland Drive Suite 200; Po Box 17934

San Diego, CA 92177-0934

Partridge, William Lindsay

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SIGNING & ENTRY OF ORDR OF DISMSL W-PREJ

06/21/2016: NOTICE OF SIGNING & ENTRY OF ORDR OF DISMSL W-PREJ

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

06/10/2016: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

06/09/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

06/06/2016: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF OSC RE- FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY CENTR

05/10/2016: NOTICE OF OSC RE- FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY CENTR

NOTICE RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED BY OCW

05/10/2016: NOTICE RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED BY OCW

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ADVO

04/04/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ADVO

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DIN

01/19/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DIN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER, DECLARATION, P

01/19/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PROPOSED ORDER, DECLARATION, P

PLA'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT CENLAR'S SEPARATE STM

01/11/2016: PLA'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT CENLAR'S SEPARATE STM

PLA'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT OCWEN'S SEPARATE STMT

01/11/2016: PLA'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT OCWEN'S SEPARATE STMT

PLA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA

01/11/2016: PLA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA

DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF PLA' OPPO TO MTN FOR

01/11/2016: DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF PLA' OPPO TO MTN FOR

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEFENDANT OCWEN'S SUMMARY

01/11/2016: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEFENDANT OCWEN'S SUMMARY

PLA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA

01/11/2016: PLA'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA

DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMM

01/11/2016: DECLARATION RE- IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR SUMM

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEFENDANT CENLAR'S SUMMAR

01/11/2016: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- DEFENDANT CENLAR'S SUMMAR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AN

11/30/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AN

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • DocketReturn Mail; Comment: RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER RE:DISMISSAL RECEIVED BACK FROM DINA YUMUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF SIGNING & ENTRY OF ORDR OF DISMSL W/PREJUDICE FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL/FTA (PLTF)/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (PLTF) BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ;10911 COURT ATTENDANT A DIAZ - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DINA LOMBOS YUMUL JASON K. BOSS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION. ATTORNEY JILLIAN A. BENBOW PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT-CENTRAL LOAN ADMIN.. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD 08:48 HALL CALLED FOR DINA LOMBOS YUMUL, NOT PRESENT. COURT PROCEEDS WITH HEARING. COUNSEL INDICATE THAT PLAINTIFF IS NOW IN PRO/PER AND IS NOT A CONDITION TO CONTINUE WITH THE LAWSUIT. THERE HAS BEEN NO CHANGE SINCE THE LAST HEARING REGARDING SETTLEMENT. COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER DATE 06/06/16 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL/FTA (PLTF)/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED BY CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FILED BY OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:; Comment: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING SERVED ON 02/11/15 WITH FEES OF $179.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150206-0442; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $3,068.71; Total Payments and Credits: $3,068.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150206-0442-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • DocketVolume Begins on this Date; Comment: VOLUME #1 BEGINS ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING is a litigant

Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant