This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 11:42:58 (UTC).

YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERS LP -V- WOOD et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOOD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0359

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERS LP

Defendants

PATRICIA WOOD

TERRY WOOD

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPHE W. CARROLLATTORNEY ATLAW

1231 I Street Ste. 203

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERSLP ORDERED ENTERED 10/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERSLP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/27/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PATRICIA WOOD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PATRICIA WOOD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00

DOES 1-10 DISMISSED ON UD COMPLAINT * FILED.

DOES 1-10 DISMISSED ON UD COMPLAINT * FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0318 $255.00; 170927-0318-VS Reference Number 026-0069933663

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO RUNNER AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERSLP ORDERED ENTERED 10/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERSLP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF YUCCA TRAILS COMMUNITY PARTNERSLP AS TO PATRICIA WOOD, TERRY WOOD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0868 $25.00; 171004-0868-DB Reference Number 026-0071314200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERRY WOOD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PATRICIA WOOD; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DOES 1-10 DISMISSED ON UD COMPLAINT * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • 12/11/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • 12/11/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0318 $255.00; 170927-0318-VS Reference Number 026-0069933663

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL, JOSEPH W