This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:12:25 (UTC).

YOO -V- GUTIERREZ/AIRADA/MOORE

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 YOO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUTIERREZ/AIRADA/MOORE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0038

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDEN YOO

Defendants

PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ

JENNIFER LINA MOORE

VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF

DAVID FRANCO AIRADA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th Street

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1129

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-27-17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-27-17); Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0057 $25.00; 170327-0057-CK Reference Number 02610

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/02/2017 OF EDEN YOO ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: EDEN YOO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/21/17 WITH FEES OF $15.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/21/17 WITH FEES OF $15.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JENNIFER LINA MOORE SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JENNIFER LINA MOORE SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DAVID FRANCO AIRADA SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO DAVID FRANCO AIRADA SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ SERVED ON 02/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $55.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECIEVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $28.33.--BEGINNING ON 02/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED TO ATTY ON 3-27-17); Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0057 $25.00; 170327-0057-CK Reference Number 02610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/02/2017 OF EDEN YOO ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: EDEN YOO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/02/2017 OF EDEN YOO AS TO PAULO FRANCO GUTIERREZ, DAVID FRANCO AIRADA, JENNIFER LINA MOORE, VALERIE A BUCKENDORFF, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0476 $4.50; 170208-0476-DB Reference Number 031-0006416981

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0776 $13.69; 170207-0776-VS Reference Number 031-0006360725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDEN YOO FOR NEW CASE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0775 $255.00; 170207-0775-VS Reference Number 031-0006360725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • 3/27/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • 3/27/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less