This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 22:18:13 (UTC).

Y.K. AMERICA -V- QUIEL BROS

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Y K AMERICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against QUIEL BROS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Donna Gunnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4805

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Garza, Donna Gunnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Y.K. AMERICA GROUP, INC

Defendant

QUIEL BROS. ELECTRIC SIGN SERVICE CO., INC.

Not Classified By Court

DELANO RETAIL CENTER, LLC

DELANO RETAIL CENTER LLC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN A TKACH

301 E Colorado Blvd Suite 514

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUI

10/21/2019: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUI

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-FOR FURTHER BILL

08/26/2019: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-FOR FURTHER BILL

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-FOR FURTHER BILL

08/26/2019: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE-FOR FURTHER BILL

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL REITER FILED

08/08/2019: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL REITER FILED

MOTION RE- FURTHER BILL OF PARTICULARS SET FOR HEA

08/02/2019: MOTION RE- FURTHER BILL OF PARTICULARS SET FOR HEA

NOTICE IMAGED

08/02/2019: NOTICE IMAGED

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY QUIEL BROS. ELECTRI ,

03/01/2019: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY QUIEL BROS. ELECTRI ,

ANSWER FILED BY Y.K. AMERICA GROUPINC; PARTY REPRE

12/14/2018: ANSWER FILED BY Y.K. AMERICA GROUPINC; PARTY REPRE

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF QUIEL BROTHER

11/15/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT OF QUIEL BROTHER

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNEMENT FILED.

11/15/2018: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNEMENT FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

11/15/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY QUIEL BROS. ELECTRI ,C SIGN SERVIC

11/15/2018: ANSWER FILED BY QUIEL BROS. ELECTRI ,C SIGN SERVIC

NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURNED SEN

11/02/2018: NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS RETURNED SEN

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

09/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

09/20/2018: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (ON DEFENSE COUNSEL'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLED.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONNA GUNNELL GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT KELLY HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: JOHN A TKACH FOR Y.K. AMERICA GROUP, INC NOT PRESENT ATTORNEY MICHAEL REITER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD 08:34 ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL. DEFENSE COUNSEL REPRESENTS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT REACHED IS IN FAVOR OF HIS CLIENT. ON DEFENSE COUNSEL'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLED. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Garza, Donna Gunnell; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/20 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional); Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY QUIEL BROS. ELECTRI ,C SIGN SERVICE CO., INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20180925-0747; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $1,110.00; Total Payments and Credits: $1,110.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY Y.K. AMERICA GROUP, INC FOR NEW FILING 180925-0747-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 180925-0747-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 14724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Y.K. AMERICA GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TKACH JOHN ANTHONY