This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 15:02:37 (UTC).

Ying -v- Curry Etal

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Ying -v- Curry Etal in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2409

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sui Ying

Defendants

Jeanette Marie Curry

Robert Gary Curry

Other

All Unknown Occupants

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF SUI YING ORDERED ENTERED 10/23/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SUI YING; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/29/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/29/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JEANETTE MARIE CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JEANETTE MARIE CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT GARY CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT GARY CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0750 $255.00; 170927-0750-CK Reference Number 17625

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0849 $25.00; 171025-0849-CK Reference Number 17847

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF SUI YING AS TO ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF SUI YING ORDERED ENTERED 10/23/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SUI YING; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROBERT GARY CURRY, JEANETTE MARIE CURRY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF SUI YING, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 09/29/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JEANETTE MARIE CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ROBERT GARY CURRY SERVED ON 10/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0750 $255.00; 170927-0750-CK Reference Number 17625

    Read MoreRead Less