This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:33:20 (UTC).

YIN "ANN" SHEN-V-LIU

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 YIN ANN SHEN-V-LIU was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9506

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

YIN "ANN" SHEN

ROBERT AVERY

LUCAS AVERY

Defendants

GUO HONG WANG

YING TAO LIU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH, HALL & STRONGIN LLP

999 Corporate Drive Suite 220

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

THE CRITES LAW FIRM

1201 Puerta Del Sol Ste 310

San Clemente, CA 92673

Defendant Attorney

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

3460 Wilshire Blvd. 8Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR LUCAS AVERY IS YIN SHEN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DONNA GUNNELL GARZA.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR LUCAS AVERY IS YIN SHEN -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DONNA GUNNELL GARZA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY YING TAO LIU.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY YING TAO LIU.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DEFS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

DEFS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON YING TAO LIU; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON YING TAO LIU; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/02/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.95 FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF YIN SHEN

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF YIN SHEN

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/13/18 FILED BY YING TAO LIU, GUO HONG WANG. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/13/18 FILED BY YING TAO LIU, GUO HONG WANG. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GUO HONG WANG SERVED ON 12/13/17 WITH FEES OF $61.65.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GUO HONG WANG SERVED ON 12/13/17 WITH FEES OF $61.65.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS FAC SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIN "ANN" SHEN, ROBERT AVERY (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: MOT TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAS FAC SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIN "ANN" SHEN, ROBERT AVERY (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YIN "ANN" SHEN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YIN "ANN" SHEN.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/13/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT YING TAO LIU, GUO HONG WANG (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/13/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT YING TAO LIU, GUO HONG WANG (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF APP/ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAL RETURNED SENT.

NOTICE OF APP/ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAL RETURNED SENT.; Minutes; APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AS LITEM IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASON: PER JUDGE- MINOR IS NOT NAMED AS PLAINTIFF.; PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: REQUEST TO CANCEL MEDIATION FILED.; Minutes; VACATE VCMS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YING TAO LIU FOR SIP ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180803-0137 $20.00; 180803-0137-CK Reference Number 39841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; JEFF HALL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR YIN "ANN" SHEN, ROBERT AVERY, LUCAS AVERY.; CHRISTIAN LAMONT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR YING TAO LIU, GUO HONG WANG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES AGREE TO ATTEND COURT SPONSERED MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 08/10/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 04/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/29/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 12 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY YING TAO LIU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY YIN "ANN" SHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY YIN "ANN" SHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR YIN "ANN" SHEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 180326-0008 $150.00; 180326-0008-VS Reference Number 033-0060060703

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF YIN SHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APP/ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GAL RETURNED SENT.; Minutes; APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AS LITEM IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE; FOLLOWING REASON: PER JUDGE- MINOR IS NOT NAMED AS PLAINTIFF.; PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF YIN SHEN FOR YIN "ANN" SHEN, ROBERT AVERY, ATTORNEY SMITH, HALL & STRONGIN LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT A CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT AS SOON AS POSSIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YIN "ANN" SHEN FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0766 $435.00; 171004-0766-CK Reference Number 6786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less