Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 07:26:13 (UTC).

YH INVESTMENT VS RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 YH INVESTMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4993

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YH INVESTMENT LLC

Defendant

MARIA RAMIREZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( COUNTER)

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; YH INVESTMENT LLC REPRESENTED BY JOSH SANCHEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIA RAMIREZ; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:42; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; JOSH SANCHEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF YH INVESTMENT LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YH INVESTMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,976.11 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $420.00 AND DAMAGES $1,765.96.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,662.07; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 08:48; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/20/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA RAMIREZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/20/17

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MARIA RAMIREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY MARIA RAMIREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0364 $255.00; 170721-0364-CK Reference Number 536193

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YH INVESTMENT LLC FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0162 $25.00; 170814-0162-CK Reference Number 537094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAUL GOODWIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; YH INVESTMENT LLC REPRESENTED BY JOSH SANCHEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIA RAMIREZ; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:42; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; JOSH SANCHEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF YH INVESTMENT LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YH INVESTMENT LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,976.11 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $420.00 AND DAMAGES $1,765.96.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,662.07; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIA RAMIREZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 08:48; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • RTS/DEFAULT/POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF YH INVESTMENT LLC AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF YH INVESTMENT LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARIA RAMIREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARIA RAMIREZ FOR FIRST RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARIA RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY MARIA RAMIREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $16.66.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,976.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170721-0364 $255.00; 170721-0364-CK Reference Number 536193

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S