This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 18:24:54 (UTC).

YERMAN-V-LEYVA

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 YERMAN-V-LEYVA was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8936

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALEY YERMAN

Defendant

JULISSA LEYVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAYTON MAGALLANES

10540 Wilshire Blvd Suite 417

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

WITNESS LIST FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

WITNESS LIST FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JULISSA LEYVA.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JULISSA LEYVA.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FURTHER MSC, TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON FURTHER MSC, TSC FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY JULISSA LEYVA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION.

ANSWER FILED BY JULISSA LEYVA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/21/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KALEY YERMAN (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/21/15, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KALEY YERMAN (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT BY COURTCALL,LLC FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT BY COURTCALL,LLC FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JULISSA LEYVA IS GRA (IMAGED); Disposition: GRANTED

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JULISSA LEYVA IS GRA (IMAGED); Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/15, FILED BY DEFENDANT JULISSA LEYVA (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/15, FILED BY DEFENDANT JULISSA LEYVA (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULISSA LEYVA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/27/15 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULISSA LEYVA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/27/15 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2016
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 06/24/2015 OF KALEY YERMAN; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST FILED BY KALEY YERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; ATTORNEY DAYTON MAGALLAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JULISSA LEYVA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT NOTES SANCTIONS HAVE BEEN PAID BY DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF COUNSEL AS PREVIOUSLY ORDERED.; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS HELD; PARTIES REPRESENTS AFTER CONFERING SETTLEMENT HAS NOT BEEN REACHED AND REEQUEST TO PROCEED TO; TRIAL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: SULMA TORRES; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAYTON MAGALLAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JULISSA LEYVA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; SETTLEMENT WAS NOT REACHED AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD TODAY. PARTIES REQUEST THIS; MATTER BE SET FOR TRIAL.; JURY WAIVED BY BOTH PARTIES SINCE NO JURY FEES HAVE BEEN POSTED.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 HOURS; EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING:; WITNESS LIST, AND EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY PAGE NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO CRC; 3.1110(C) (F), 10 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30; DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUTE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN; MONETARY SANCTIONS, EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESS.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 06/24/2015 OF KALEY YERMAN IS SET FOR 08/05/16 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER FROM 4/8/16 HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • PARTY JULISSA LEYVA UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICE OF ESTEFAN M ENCARNACION WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JULISSA LEYVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KALEY YERMAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON KALEY YERMAN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KALEY YERMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.