This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 05:16:11 (UTC).

YELLOW BOOK -V- YESENIA SAHAGUN

Case Summary

On 03/02/2011 YELLOW BOOK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YESENIA SAHAGUN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2231

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I

Defendant

YESENIA SAHAGUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAKAMAKI & BAUMGARTNER

500 N. State College Blvd. Suite 1100

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 130809-0336 $60.00; 130809-0336-CK Reference Number 7828

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YESENIA SAHAGUN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,009.32 INTEREST $1,919.97 ATTORNEY FEES $750.93 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,985.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YESENIA SAHAGUN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,009.32 INTEREST $1,919.97 ATTORNEY FEES $750.93 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,985.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I AS TO DOES ONLY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON YESENIA SAHAGUN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON YESENIA SAHAGUN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON YESENIA SAHAGUN.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON YESENIA SAHAGUN.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST/LATE CHARGE FILED BY YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I

DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST/LATE CHARGE FILED BY YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST YESENIA SAHAGUN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST YESENIA SAHAGUN FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO YESENIA SAHAGUN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO YESENIA SAHAGUN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110302-1466 $240.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2013
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/NO SERVICE; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 130809-0336 $60.00; 130809-0336-CK Reference Number 7828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110920-0785 $25.00; 110920-0785-CK Reference Number 4644

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/11; JUDGMENT FOR: YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YESENIA SAHAGUN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,009.32 INTEREST $1,919.97 ATTORNEY FEES $750.93 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $8,985.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON YESENIA SAHAGUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST/LATE CHARGE FILED BY YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST YESENIA SAHAGUN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I AS TO YESENIA SAHAGUN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF S&C FILED AS TO YESENIA SAHAGUN. PARTY SERVED ON 03/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2011 OF YELLOWBOOK SALES AND DISTRIBUTION COMPANY,I - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110302-1466 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.