This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:39:53 (UTC).

YAZDANI -V- BRADFORD

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 YAZDANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRADFORD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4058

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HOSSEIN YAZDANI

PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,

Defendants

ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTORVEHICLES,

Cross Plaintiff

ROZALYNN BRADFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MADISON HATBOR, ALC

17702 Mitchell North

Irvine, CA 92614

MADDISON LAW

17702 Mitchell North

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF REBEKAH RYAN MAIN

Po Box 2489

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91729

 

Court Documents

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DECLARATION OF PAIG L COUNSMAN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

DECLARATION OF PAIG L COUNSMAN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS; Disposition: Continued

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SANDRA ORTEGA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES R. SPEIGHTS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BESSIE MAFUD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:32; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATORNEY SPEIGHTS REPRESENTS HIS CLIENT HAS NOT RECEIVED THE ARBITRATION AWARD.; ATTORNEY MAFUD REPRESENTS THERE IS A SETTLEMENT, BUT THERE IS A PROBLEM WITH ISSUING THE PAYMENT.; COURT NOTES REGARDING THE ARBITRATION AWARD, IN LIEU OF AWARD PLAINTIFF IS TO MAKE THE PAYMENT.; IF NO PAYMENT IS MADE, THE PREVAILING PARTY TO FILE A PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; IF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THIS MATTER WILL BE TAKEN OFF; CALENDAR.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:37; ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION OF ERIC J BAUTISTA OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION FILED

DECLARATION OF ERIC J BAUTISTA OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION FILED

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE/JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE/JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIC J. BAUTISTA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOSSEIN YAZDANI, PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,.; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT ROZALYNN BRADFORD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:39; COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT INFORMS THE COURT AN ARBITRATION AWARD WAS PREVIOUSLY GRANTED AND; THE MATTER HAS SINCE BEEN RE-OPENED TO ALLOW BRIEFING ON ADDING FURTHER AWARD FOR ATTORNEY; FEES.; SHOULD THE MATTER NOT BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT TO; FILE DECLARATION WITH THE COURT AS TO THE STATUS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POST ARBITRATION STATUS SET FOR 06/20/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:41; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION); Disposition: Pre-D Complete

HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIC J. BAUTISTA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOSSEIN YAZDANI.; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:02; CROSS COMPLAINANT COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THEY HAVE NOT YET ATTENDED ARBITRATION. ARBITRATION; HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/19 BEFORE THE AAA-PETER K RUNDLE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE/JUDGMENT SET FOR 04/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:06; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI, ON 10/16/18

HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION); Disposition: Continued

HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD.; ATTORNEY REBECCA CHMURA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOSSEIN YAZDANI, PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:52; COURT NOTES THAT PACIFIC AUTO CENTER IS A DBA OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: FOR ARBITRATION TO BE COMPLETED.; COURT STAYS ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:57; ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: JAMES S SIFERS RE HEARING ON STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI

DECLARATION RE: JAMES S SIFERS RE HEARING ON STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (10.13.17) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSSEIN YAZDANI; Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (10.13.17) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOSSEIN YAZDANI; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIN COLLINS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD.; MOTION; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:53; HOSSEIN YAZDANI'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS HEARD.; THE COURTS TENTATIVE RULING IS TO GRANT THE MOTION AND STAY THE ACTION.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING.; HOSSEIN YAZDANI'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS GRANTED.; THE PARTIES ARE TO MAKE THE NECESSARY ARRANGMENTS FOR ARBITRATION.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION) SET FOR 04/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REPLY TO OPPOP TO MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/14/17 FILED BY ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOP TO MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 11/14/17 FILED BY ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT, ROZALYNN BRADFORD RE PROPER VENUE FILED.

DECLARATION OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT, ROZALYNN BRADFORD RE PROPER VENUE FILED.

STIP AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 07/19/17 FILED.

STIP AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON 07/19/17 FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD SERVED ON 06/10/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD SERVED ON 06/10/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF PAIG L COUNSMAN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SANDRA ORTEGA; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES R. SPEIGHTS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BESSIE MAFUD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:32; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATORNEY SPEIGHTS REPRESENTS HIS CLIENT HAS NOT RECEIVED THE ARBITRATION AWARD.; ATTORNEY MAFUD REPRESENTS THERE IS A SETTLEMENT, BUT THERE IS A PROBLEM WITH ISSUING THE PAYMENT.; COURT NOTES REGARDING THE ARBITRATION AWARD, IN LIEU OF AWARD PLAINTIFF IS TO MAKE THE PAYMENT.; IF NO PAYMENT IS MADE, THE PREVAILING PARTY TO FILE A PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/21/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; IF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING THIS MATTER WILL BE TAKEN OFF; CALENDAR.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:37; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ERIC J BAUTISTA OSC RE: POST ARBITRATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROZALYNN M. BRADFORD FOR FAX FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY ROZALYNN BRADFORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE/JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIC J. BAUTISTA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOSSEIN YAZDANI, PACIFIC AUTO CENTER,.; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT ROZALYNN BRADFORD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:39; COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT INFORMS THE COURT AN ARBITRATION AWARD WAS PREVIOUSLY GRANTED AND; THE MATTER HAS SINCE BEEN RE-OPENED TO ALLOW BRIEFING ON ADDING FURTHER AWARD FOR ATTORNEY; FEES.; SHOULD THE MATTER NOT BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, COUNSEL FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT TO; FILE DECLARATION WITH THE COURT AS TO THE STATUS.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POST ARBITRATION STATUS SET FOR 06/20/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:41; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ERIC J BAUTISTA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE (ARBITRATION); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIC J. BAUTISTA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR HOSSEIN YAZDANI.; ATTORNEY REBEKAH RYAN MAIN PRESENT FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:02; CROSS COMPLAINANT COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THEY HAVE NOT YET ATTENDED ARBITRATION. ARBITRATION; HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR 01/14/19 BEFORE THE AAA-PETER K RUNDLE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POST ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE/JUDGMENT SET FOR 04/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:06; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF HOSSEIN YAZDANI, ON 10/16/18

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM BCW TO BCWM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170308-0061 $380.00; 170308-0061-CK Reference Number D 3543383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • PLAINTIFF HOSSEIN YAZDANI FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF STATEMENT OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES FILED BY HOSSEIN YAZDANI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less