This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:13:16 (UTC).

YAP VS MONJARAZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 YAP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONJARAZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4717

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALENA YAP

Defendants

JASMIN MONJARAZ

LEONARDO VALLEJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF GALENA YAP (IMAGED)

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF GALENA YAP (IMAGED)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0332 $255.00; 170718-0332-CK Reference Number 59144

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED/FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 OF GALENA YAP (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $36.66.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0332 $255.00; 170718-0332-CK Reference Number 59144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $4,125.00

    Read MoreRead Less