This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 07:41:23 (UTC).

XIAOLVMA-V-TSAI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 XIAOLVMA-V-TSAI was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2875

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD.

Defendants

YICEN TSAI

HAO MEI BIRTHING CENTER

MAMA'S HOME CONSULTING, INC.

YILUN TSAI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

, LIU LAW, INC

529 E. Valley Blvd, Suite 208-A

San Gabriel, CA 91776

LAW OFFICE OF JAMES ZHOU

17700 Castleton St Ste 568

City Of Industry, CA 91748

Defendant Attorneys

APEX LAWYERS INC

21671 Gateway Center Dr Suite 108

Diamond Bar, CA 91765-2463

CHANG & COTE, LLP

19138 E Walnut Dr N Ste 100

Rowland Heights, CA 91748

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HAO MEI BIRTHING CENTER SERVED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $188.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HAO MEI BIRTHING CENTER SERVED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $188.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YICEN TSAI SERVED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $353.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YICEN TSAI SERVED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $353.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HANZHANG XU PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY SHAZAD OMAR PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THIS MATTER IS SET FOR TRIAL AS STATED BELOW.; PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT WAIVE TRIAL BY JURY.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL: 7 DAYS.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 01/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; COURT TRIAL ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD. IS SET FOR 01/28/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • CK 3620023807 SENT TO CHANGE & COTE LLP $810.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO YILUN TSAI, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0063572856

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YICEN TSAI FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180417-0892 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CHANG & COTE, LLP WITH APEX LAWYERS INC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR YICEN TSAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY YICEN TSAI, MAMA'S HOME CONSULTING, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CHANG & COTE, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • CHANG & COTE, LLP IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR YILUN TSAI, AND PRO/PER IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD. FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170726-0901 $12.00; 170726-0901-VS Reference Number 033-0027184525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD. FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0246 $1.50; 170712-0246-VS Reference Number 033-0025333487

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY XIAOLVMA INTERNATIONAL CONSULTING CO. LTD. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES/FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0145 $461.00; 170712-0145-VS Reference Number 033-0025317432

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less