This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:23:28 (UTC).

WUO V HORSE

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 WUO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HORSE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2104

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVE WUO

Defendant

SONIA AMERICAN HORSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RODDICK, ROBERT

715 N. Arrowhead Ave #113

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110920-1996 $25.00; 110920-1996-CK Reference Number 421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • WRIT RETURN RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY ENFORCEMENT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT; 11:25; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF STEVE WUO PRESENT; ATTORNEY ROBERT RODDICK PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT SONIA AMERICAN HORSE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED.; THE COURT ORDERS THE JUDGMENT ENTERED 05/26/11 SET ASIDE AND THE STIPULATED JUDGMENT REACHED; TODAY ENTERED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF STEVE WUO.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SONIA AMERICAN HORSE.; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF STEVE WUO ORDERED ENTERED 09/07/11; JUDGMENT FOR: STEVE WUO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SONIA AMERICAN HORSE; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SONIA AMERICAN HORSE. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,200.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $255.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,455.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 10/02/11. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 5TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 09/19/11.; IN ADDITION TO THE JUDGMENT, $500.00 WILL BE PAID ON 09/17/11 AND $900.00 ON OR BEFORE 09/17/11 FOR; A TOTAL SUM OF $1400.00 ON SPACE #29.; STIPULATED JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); THE COURT ORDERS ANY CURRENT LOCKOUT STAYED UNTIL 09/19/11.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY SHERIFF OF STAY OF LOCKOUT.; 11:36; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SONIA AMERICAN HORSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SONIA AMERICAN HORSE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SONIA AMERICAN HORSE FOR EX-PARTE MOTION HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY ENFORCEMENT OF WRIT OF EXECUTION TO BE HEARD ON 09/07/11 AT 07:45 IN DEPARTMENT S31X.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SONIA AMERICAN HORSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SONIA AMERICAN HORSE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SONIA AMERICAN HORSE FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY SONIA AMERICAN HORSE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,244.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110505-0040 $255.00; 110505-0040-CK Reference Number 634

    Read MoreRead Less