This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:08:17 (UTC).

WUO -V- CORONA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 WUO filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against CORONA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9406

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

KATHY WUO

Respondent

AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA

Other

LABOR COMMISSIONER

464 West 4Th Street Room 348

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW L TAYOLOR

8301 Utica Avenue Suite 201

Ranch Cucamonga, CA 91730

Other Attorney

LABOR COMMISSIONEROF CALIFORNIA

464 West 4Th Street Room 348

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLAS/RESDNT MTN TO ADVANCE THE TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KATHY WUO (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PLAS/RESDNT MTN TO ADVANCE THE TRIAL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KATHY WUO (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF HEATHER J HAMBY FILED

DECLARATION OF HEATHER J HAMBY FILED

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN DAVIDSON IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN DAVIDSON IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF MTN TO COMPEL/SEPARATE STATEMENT BY MAIL ON 04/05/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW L TAYLOR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF MTN TO COMPEL/SEPARATE STATEMENT BY MAIL ON 04/05/18 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW L TAYLOR, FILED.

NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO-CORONA FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO-CORONA FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY MAIL ON 03/29/18 AS TO MATTHEW L TAYLOR, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY MAIL ON 03/29/18 AS TO MATTHEW L TAYLOR, FILED.

NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY ABRAHAM GOMEZ-SAUCEDO FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

NOTICE OF CLAIMS BY ABRAHAM GOMEZ-SAUCEDO FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF MOTION SENT.

NOTICE OF MOTION SENT.; Minutes; MOTION IS RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MOTION NOT RESERVED IN ADVANCE. DATE NOT; AVAILABLE. PLEASE CALL 909-708-8678 AND RESERVE A DATE. THANK YOU.; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF HEARINGS AND TRIAL SETTING ORDERS FILED BY KATHY WUO.

NOTICE OF HEARINGS AND TRIAL SETTING ORDERS FILED BY KATHY WUO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KATHY WUO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KATHY WUO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

ORDER ON RFA GRANTED RELATING THIS CASE TO CIVDS1723346 FILED

ORDER ON RFA GRANTED RELATING THIS CASE TO CIVDS1723346 FILED

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MATTHEW TAYLOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BENJAMIN DAVIDSON PRESENT FOR DEFT AMANDA SAUCEDO CORONA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:42; COURT FINDS CASE NO: CIVDS1719406 RELATED TO CASE NO: CIVDS1719407.; COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THIS MATTER IS AN APPEAL FROM THE LABOR COMMISIONER AND THE AMOUNT; TO BE AWARDED IN THE CASE EXCEEDS THE LIMITED JURISDICTION AMOUNT.; THE COURT NOW REASSIGNS THIS MATTER IN DEPARTMENT S24 TO BE HEARD AS AN UNLIMITED MATTER WITH THE; HONORABLE JUDGE DONNA GARZA.; THE COURT FURTHER CONTINUES THIS MATTER AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL AS PARTIES WOULD LIKE TO; PROCEED WITH DISCOVERY AND THE SETTING OF DEPOSITIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; NOTICE WAIVED.; 08:47; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0730 $435.00; 171004-0730-CK Reference Number 1198

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF KATHY WUO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • HEARING RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT HAS RECEIVED AND REVIEWED THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY COUNSEL FOR KATHY WUO ON; 12/08/17.; THE COURT NOTES THAT NO PREVIOUS ACTION WAS TAKEN REGARDING THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED IN; THIS MATTER OR CASE CIVDS1723346.; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE CASES ARE NOT DEEMED RELATED. EACH CASE TO REMAIN AS PRESENTLY; ASSIGNED.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSE FILED BY RESPONDENT AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180504-0546 $5.00; 180504-0546-VS Reference Number #033-0066257528

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180502-0941 $15.00; 180502-0941-VS Reference Number 033-0065918907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: ADVANCE TRIAL TO 10/01/18 SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/18 FILED BY AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DECLARATION OF HEATHER J HAMBY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF NEED TO FILE NTC OF RELATED CASE IN CIVDS1719407 SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: A NOTICE OF RELATED CASE MUST BE FILED IN EACH OF THE CASES TO BE RELATED. A; NOTICE OF RELATED CASE MUST ALSO BE FILED IN CIVDS1719407.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED AS TO AMANDA LETICIA SAUCEDO CORONA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/12/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS US MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE BY US MAIL ON 10/12/17 AS TO DEFENDANT/APPELLANT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH LAW OFFICES OF MATTHEW L TAYOLOR AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR KATHY WUO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF KATHY WUO, LABOR COMMISSIONER IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0730 $435.00; 171004-0730-CK Reference Number 1198

    Read MoreRead Less