This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:16:45 (UTC).

WUNSCHEL FAMILY TRUST DAT JANUARY 13,1993

Case Summary

On 12/06/2016 WUNSCHEL FAMILY TRUST DAT JANUARY 13,1993 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1208

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STEVEN FRAZIER

LUANN CUNNINGHAM

Other

WUNSCHEL FAM ILY TRUST DA TED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

JAIME K GALATI

12526 High Bluff Drive Ste 300

San Diego, CA 92130

MORRILL LAW FIRM

2175 N California Blvd #424

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED.

PETITION RE: OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

PETITION RE: OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF VENUE FILED.

PETITION RE: OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

PETITION RE: OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION OF DANIEL LEAHY FILED

DECLARATION OF DANIEL LEAHY FILED

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION OF LUANN CUNNINGHAM FILED

DECLARATION OF LUANN CUNNINGHAM FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/24/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/24/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED.

HRG OF 02/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFIED MAIL GREEN CARD RETURNED SIGNED BY SUPERIOR COURT CONTRA COSTA (IMAGED)

CERTIFIED MAIL GREEN CARD RETURNED SIGNED BY SUPERIOR COURT CONTRA COSTA (IMAGED)

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY CONTRA COSTA COUNTY DATED 06/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY CONTRA COSTA COUNTY DATED 06/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY CONTRA COSTA COUNTY DATED 06/14/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL GREEN CARD RETURNED SIGNED BY SUPERIOR COURT CONTRA COSTA (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • TRANSFERRED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT - COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTY; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: CHANGE OF VENUE (PROBATE); DISPOSITION CHANGE OF VENUE (PROBATE); CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUANN CUNNINGHAM FOR TRANSFER TO CONTRA COUNTY; Minutes; Receipt: 170530-0971 $50.00; 170530-0971-CK Reference Number 1401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PETITION FOR OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • MOTION RE: TO TRANSFER CASE TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED BY PETITIONER LUANN CUNNINGHAM; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR TRANSFER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • VACATE PETPR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON STIP & ORDER RE CONTINUANCE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVEN FRAZIER FOR FAXED STIP & ORDR; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0930 $24.00; 170208-0930-MC Reference Number 031-0006434778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON STIP AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON STIP AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/14/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170210-0111 $10.00; 170210-0111-VS Reference Number 031-0006532925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: OF STEVEN FRAZIER TO VALIDATE PURPORTED 5TH AMENDMENT OF THE TRUST BASED ON UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161206-0845 $465.00; 161206-0845-CK Reference Number 3500649

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.