This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:31:42 (UTC).

WRIGHT -V- LI

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 WRIGHT -V- LI was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1522

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBARA WRIGHT

Defendants

MAY ZHOU

JINGYI LI

YANG HONG WEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE KLEIN & MARIAS

3536 Concours Suite 210

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0003 $435.00; 171031-0003-CK Reference Number 005855

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JINGYI LI SERVED ON 01/26/18 WITH FEES OF $79.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JINGYI LI SERVED ON 01/26/18 WITH FEES OF $79.95.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY BARBARA WRIGHT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY BARBARA WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JINGYI LI SERVED ON 01/26/18 WITH FEES OF $79.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF BARBARA WRIGHT FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0003 $435.00; 171031-0003-CK Reference Number 005855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less