This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:54:08 (UTC).

WOODPECKER RD TITLE HOLDING -V- ESPERANZA

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 WOODPECKER RD TITLE HOLDING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESPERANZA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1609

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODPECKER RD TITLE HOLDING TRUST

Defendant

ANGULO ESPERANZA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANGULO ESPERANZA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,184.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $1,129.74.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,633.74; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170807-0701 $25.00; 170807-0701-CK Reference Number 6449

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST ORDERED ENTERED 07/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANGULO ESPERANZA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANGULO ESPERANZA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/17/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/17/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANGULO ESPERANZA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANGULO ESPERANZA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANGULO ESPERANZA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANGULO ESPERANZA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2017
View Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2017
View Court Documents

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: WOODPECKER RD TITLEHOLDING TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANGULO ESPERANZA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,184.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $1,129.74.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,633.74; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017
View Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017
View Court Documents

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 09/07/17.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $320.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

585 RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017
View Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
07/24/2017
View Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT IS NAMED ON CASE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017
View Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2017

TENANT REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FORM STATES IT IS TO BE MAILED TO UDR CONSUMER DISCLOSURES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017

FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0443 $255.00; 170714-0443-VS Reference Number 026-0057166358

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017

CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017
View Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017

PAST DUE RENT IS $2,184.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017

DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $29.73.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2017
View Court Documents

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less