This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 02:56:03 (UTC).

WLP EVERGREEN V GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 WLP EVERGREEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8731

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

FRANKIE GONZALEZ

JACQUELINE GONZALEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,567.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $515.00 AND DAMAGES $835.68.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,417.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0845 $25.00; 170109-0845-CK Reference Number 528729

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

AMENDED RETURN WRIT OF POSSESSION UNSATISFIED/COSTS OF $125 FILED.

AMENDED RETURN WRIT OF POSSESSION UNSATISFIED/COSTS OF $125 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/16/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/16/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

DECLARATION OF LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/17; JUDGMENT FOR: WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANKIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANKIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0487 $255.00; 161214-0487-CK Reference Number 527894

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED RETURN WRIT OF POSSESSION UNSATISFIED/COSTS OF $125 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LOST OR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/14/2016 OF WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: WLP EVERGREEN APARTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,567.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $515.00 AND DAMAGES $835.68.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,417.68; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170109-0845 $25.00; 170109-0845-CK Reference Number 528729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/16/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ, FRANKIE GONZALEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JACQUELINE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON FRANKIE GONZALEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/16/16 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,567.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $52.23.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0487 $255.00; 161214-0487-CK Reference Number 527894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.