This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 16:10:44 (UTC).

W&L VS COLTON

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 W L filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COLTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1186

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W&L INTERNATIONAL

Defendants

NORMAN COLTON

SHIRLY COLTON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0975 $255.00; 170221-0975-CK Reference Number CK 1166992

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY NORMAN COLTON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY NORMAN COLTON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON NORMAN COLTON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/21/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON NORMAN COLTON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/21/17

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/21/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/21/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:20 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHIRLY COLTON FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHIRLY COLTON FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHIRLY COLTON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/21/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHIRLY COLTON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/21/17

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:42; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NORMAN COLTON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; KAY WACHUKU IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- NORMAN COLTON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/21/2017 OF W&L INTERNATIONAL ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: W&L INTERNATIONAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NORMAN COLTON, SHIRLY COLTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $750.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $750.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,405.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: NORMAN COLTON, SHIRLY COLTON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 10:07; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER WINDOW)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER WINDOW); Minutes; Receipt: 170330-0258 $25.00

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketLEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER WINDOW); Minutes; Receipt: 170330-0258 $25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:42; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NORMAN COLTON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; KAY WACHUKU IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; WITNESS -- NORMAN COLTON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/21/2017 OF W&L INTERNATIONAL ORDERED ENTERED 03/30/17; JUDGMENT FOR: W&L INTERNATIONAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NORMAN COLTON, SHIRLY COLTON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $750.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $405.00 AND DAMAGES $750.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,405.00; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: NORMAN COLTON, SHIRLY COLTON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 10:07; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHIRLY COLTON; PARTY SERVED ON 02/21/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHIRLY COLTON FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/21/2017 OF W&L INTERNATIONAL AS TO SHIRLY COLTON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/21/2017 OF W&L INTERNATIONAL AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NORMAN COLTON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE WAIVED ON NORMAN COLTON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NORMAN COLTON.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID BY NORMAN COLTON, SHIRLY COLTON FOR ANSWER PACKET; Minutes; Receipt: 170224-0704 $1.73; 170224-0704-DB Reference Number 031-0007705698

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170221-0975 $255.00; 170221-0975-CK Reference Number CK 1166992

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketPAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 03/01/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less