This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:12:34 (UTC).

W&L INTERNATIONAL-V-JONES

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 W L INTERNATIONAL-V-JONES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4714

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W & L INTERNATIONAL

Defendants

GEORGETTA JONES

LOGAN JAMES III

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

JOHN E BOUZANE ATTORNEY AT LAW

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF W & L INTERNATIONAL ORDERED ENTERED 07/25/17; JUDGMENT FOR: W & L INTERNATIONAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN HG LONG BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN HG LONG BIN)

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0229 $255.00; 170712-0229-CK Reference Number 1174798

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GEORGETTA JONES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GEORGETTA JONES; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LOGAN JAMES III; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LOGAN JAMES III; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF W & L INTERNATIONAL GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: W & L INTERNATIONAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $700.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $1,283.15.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,958.15; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH JOHN E BOUZANE ATTORNEY AT LAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR W & L INTERNATIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0125 $25.00; 170727-0125-CK Reference Number 1176268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN HG LONG BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF W & L INTERNATIONAL, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GEORGETTA JONES, LOGAN JAMES III, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON LOGAN JAMES III; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $23.33.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0229 $255.00; 170712-0229-CK Reference Number 1174798

    Read MoreRead Less