This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:12:12 (UTC).

Witherell Living Trust

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 Witherell Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1077

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LINDA SCHAEFER

Other

WITHERELL LIVING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEST BEST & KRIEGER

2855 East Guasti Road Suite 400

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF FUNDS FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF FUNDS FILED.

ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST RESPONDENT WILLIAM WITHERELL FILED

ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST RESPONDENT WILLIAM WITHERELL FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/08/18 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/08/18 W/POS FILED.

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/14/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY LINDA SCHAEFER.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO OSC RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY LINDA SCHAEFER.

HRG OF 12/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/14/17 AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/14/17 AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/16/17 AS TO WILLIAM WITHERELL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION, ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 11/16/17 AS TO WILLIAM WITHERELL, FILED.

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUS E RE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AGAINST RESPONDENT FILED

ORDER TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUS E RE PRELIMINARY INJUCTION AGAINST RESPONDENT FILED

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NTC TO WILLIAM WITHERELL FILED BY LINDA SCHAEFER

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NTC TO WILLIAM WITHERELL FILED BY LINDA SCHAEFER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ETC FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ETC FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 10/30/2017 OF LINDA SCHAEFER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 10/30/2017 OF LINDA SCHAEFER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180509-0608 $27.00; 180509-0608-CK Reference Number 3190

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO INVALIDATE TRANSFER OF FUNDS AND DESIGNATIONS OF DEATH BENEFICIARY DUE TO UNDUE INFLUENCE ETC; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180306-0355 $27.00; 180306-0355-CK Reference Number 125216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF FUNDS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA SCHAEFER FOR STIPULATION FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180102-0162 $20.00; 180102-0162-CK Reference Number #122891

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON STIP/ORDER RE TRANSFER OF FUNDS RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST RESPONDENT WILLIAM WITHERELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/08/18 W/POS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA SCHAEFER FOR EXPARTE APPL FOR TEMP RESTRAINING ORDR; Minutes; Receipt: 171109-0783 $90.00; 171109-0783-CK Reference Number 121568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ETC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO EX PARTE HAS BEEN FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH TRUST FILED 10/30/2017 OF LINDA SCHAEFER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA SCHAEFER FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0536 $465.00; 171030-0536-CK Reference Number 120874

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO INVALIDATE TRANSFER OF FUNDS AND DESIGNATTIONS OF DEATH BENEFICIARY DUE TO UNDUE INFLUENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less