This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 20:19:50 (UTC).

WINSLOW-V-CLICKENBEARD

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 WINSLOW-V-CLICKENBEARD was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0963

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE J WINSLOW

Defendants

SCOTT CLINKENBEARD

NOELLE CLINKENBEARD

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

ORDER SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: OTHER COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED BY LAWRENCE J WINSLOW

DECLARATION RE: SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED BY LAWRENCE J WINSLOW

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170605-0504 $25.00; 170605-0504-CK Reference Number 1172705

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW ORDERED ENTERED 06/02/17; JUDGMENT FOR LAWRENCE J WINSLOW.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 06/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/04/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/04/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NOELLE CLINKENBEARD SERVED ON 05/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NOELLE CLINKENBEARD SERVED ON 05/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SCOTT CLINKENBEARD SERVED ON 05/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SCOTT CLINKENBEARD SERVED ON 05/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170502-0103 $255.00; 170502-0103-CK Reference Number 1172014

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS CASE FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: OTHER COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: OTHER COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAWRENCE J WINSLOW FOR DECLARATION; Minutes; Receipt: 170620-0376 $20.00; 170620-0376-CK Reference Number 1164939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: SET ASIDE JUDGMENT & DISMISS ENTIRE CASE FILED BY LAWRENCE J WINSLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170605-0504 $25.00; 170605-0504-CK Reference Number 1172705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/02/2017 OF LAWRENCE WINSLOW AS TO SCOTT CLINKENBEARD, NOELLE CLINKENBEARD, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER(NOELLE CLINKENBEARD) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE(UNABLE TO FORWARD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER(ALL UNKNOWNS) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE(UNABLE TO FORWARD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER(SCOTT CLINKENBEARD) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE(UNABLE TO FORWARD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • I MAILED THE NOTICES TO THE DEFENDANTS PO BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170502-0103 $255.00; 170502-0103-CK Reference Number 1172014

    Read MoreRead Less