This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 15:48:18 (UTC).

WILTERDING -V- PACIFIC GAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 WILTERDING filed an Other lawsuit against PACIFIC GAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6970

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT WILTERDING

Defendant

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SEDGWICK LLP

333 Bush Street 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94101-2834

 

Court Documents

NTC OF NON OPPO TO DEF PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC CO DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

NTC OF NON OPPO TO DEF PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC CO DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY MAIL ON 03/09/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY MAIL ON 03/09/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 03/08/17 AS TO SEDGWICK, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION BY MAIL ON 03/08/17 AS TO SEDGWICK, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR JUDCIAL NOTICE BY MAIL ON 03/02/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR JUDCIAL NOTICE BY MAIL ON 03/02/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; REPRESENTED BY SEDGWICK LLP(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; REPRESENTED BY SEDGWICK LLP(IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED AS TO PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. PARTY SERVED ON 12/30/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT WILTERDING

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ROBERT WILTERDING

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEF DECL IN SPPT OF DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEF DECL IN SPPT OF DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/23/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES FILED BY PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY.

DECLARATION OF MISREPRESENTATIONS FILED

DECLARATION OF MISREPRESENTATIONS FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER 3/8/17(RETURN TO SENDER RECEIVED BACK FROM ROBERT WILTERDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF NON OPPO TO DEF PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC CO DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY MAIL ON 03/09/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY MAIL ON 03/09/17 AS TO SEDGWICK LLP, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT WILTERDING FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROBERT WILTERDING FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161011-0268 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY ROBERT WILTERDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.