This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 16:52:30 (UTC).

WILSON-V-COFFMAN SPECIALTIES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 WILSON-V-COFFMAN SPECIALTIES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0209

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAYCION WILSON

Defendant

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO COFFMAN SPECIALTIES. PARTY SERVED ON 03/11/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO COFFMAN SPECIALTIES. PARTY SERVED ON 03/11/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1783 $50.00; 160201-1783-VS Reference Number 027-0299603484

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: D. GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JAYCION WILSON PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: COFFMAN SPECIALTIES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- JAYCION WILSON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COFFMAN SPECIALTIES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST COFFMAN SPECIALTIES.; JUDGMENT FOR: JAYCION WILSON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COFFMAN SPECIALTIES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,815.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,940.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2026
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 03/28/26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/30/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:52; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: D. GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF JAYCION WILSON PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: COFFMAN SPECIALTIES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; WITNESS -- JAYCION WILSON IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COFFMAN SPECIALTIES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST COFFMAN SPECIALTIES.; JUDGMENT FOR: JAYCION WILSON; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COFFMAN SPECIALTIES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,815.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $125.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,940.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO COFFMAN SPECIALTIES. PARTY SERVED ON 03/11/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1783 $50.00; 160201-1783-VS Reference Number 027-0299603484

    Read MoreRead Less