This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:55:19 (UTC).

WILSHIRE -V- TOLENTINO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 WILSHIRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOLENTINO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0873

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE COMMERCIAL CAPITAL, LLC

Defendant

ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0224 $100.00; 170131-0224-CK Reference Number 208963

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WILSHIRE COMMERCIALCAPITAL, LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:37; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; WILSHIRE COMMERCIALCAPITAL, LLC REPRESENTED BY ALICHIA LOVE.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ALICHIA LOVE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO.; JUDGMENT FOR: WILSHIRE COMMERCIALCAPITAL, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $110.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,610.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANTHONY C. TOLENTINO. PARTY SERVED ON 02/15/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170131-0224 $100.00; 170131-0224-CK Reference Number 208963

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.