This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/03/2020 at 10:14:23 (UTC).

WHITE -V- HAIRSTON

Case Summary

On 02/22/2017 WHITE filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against HAIRSTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3616

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHESTER WHITE

Defendants

BRIAN HAIRSTON

MAVERICK THE BARBARIAN TRANSPORT, INC

Assignee and Other

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONSON, D STEPHEN

6850 Brockton Avenue, Suite 210

Riverside, CA 92506

Assignee Attorney

DIR/DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMNET

464 W 4Th St Room 348

San Bernardino, CA 92404

Other Attorney

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

464 W 4Th Street Rm. 348

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED ADDING LABOR COMMISSIONER,STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED ADDING LABOR COMMISSIONER,STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $370.16)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $370.16)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH D STEPHEN MONSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHESTER WHITE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH D STEPHEN MONSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHESTER WHITE.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED

JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE ORDERED ENTERED 02/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CHESTER WHITE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRIAN HAIRSTON, MAVERICK THE BARBARIAN TRANSPORT, INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,821.61 INTEREST $24.33 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $240.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,085.94; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED ADDING LABOR COMMISSIONER,STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( 6481.10 ); ; Minutes; Receipt: 171027-0753 $25.00 ; 171027-0753-CK Reference Number 10818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $370.16)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketWRIT/MC-012/CK#10818 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE 1ST DEBTOR HAS A DBA WHICH MUST BE REFLECTED O N LINE 4 OF WRIT (SEE ATTACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH D STEPHEN MONSON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHESTER WHITE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED; ; Minutes; ; JUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE ORDERED ENTERED 02/22/17; ; ; JUDGMENT FOR: CHESTER WHITE; ; ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRIAN HAIRSTON, MAVERICK THE BARBARIAN TRANSPORT, INC; ; ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,821.61 INTEREST $24.33 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $240.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; ; ; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,085.94; ; ; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ; DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketON THE LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE, MAVERICK THE BARBARIAN TRANSPORT, INC IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON LABOR BOARD JUDGMENT (LIMITED) FILED 02/22/2017 OF CHESTER WHITE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR

    Read MoreRead Less