This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 18:28:14 (UTC).

WHEELS FINANCIAL-V-MENA

Case Summary

On 05/10/2017 WHEELS FINANCIAL-V-MENA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0843

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

CHRISTINA MARIE MENA

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.80 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.80 FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2793.70 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2793.70 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180329-0886 $25.00; 180329-0886-CK Reference Number 250133

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $31.34 FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $31.34 FILED.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC REPRESENTED BY ROBERTO MONTEJANO.; DEFENDANT CHRISTINA MARIE MENA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:15; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTINA MARIE MENA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $185.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,685.50; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $200.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 07/28/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 28TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE MENA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $75.50. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE MENA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $75.50. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0710 $100.00; 170510-0710-CK Reference Number 242757

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0710 $100.00; 170510-0710-CK Reference Number 242757

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 07/15/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.80 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 2793.70 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180329-0886 $25.00; 180329-0886-CK Reference Number 250133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AMOUNT ON 11 DOES NOT MATCH THE JUDGMENT AMOUNT *.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $31.34 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • WRIT/MOC RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AMOUNT OF PRINCIPAL REMAINING DUE DOES NOT MATCH COST BILL.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 07/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC REPRESENTED BY ROBERTO MONTEJANO.; DEFENDANT CHRISTINA MARIE MENA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:15; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: WHEELS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTINA MARIE MENA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $185.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,685.50; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $200.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 07/28/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 28TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE MENA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $75.50. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0710 $100.00; 170510-0710-CK Reference Number 242757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less