This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:34:54 (UTC).

WESTWIND -V- MONZANO/SEPOLVEDA

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 WESTWIND filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONZANO/SEPOLVEDA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5263

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC

Defendants

SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA

ALBERTO MONZANO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM M GARRETT,JR

463 N. Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0556 $25.00; 170817-0556-CK Reference Number 59266

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/30/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/30/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ALBERTO MONZANO SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ALBERTO MONZANO SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0839 $255.00; 170727-0839-CK Reference Number 59243

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0556 $25.00; 170817-0556-CK Reference Number 59266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC AS TO ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/15/17; JUDGMENT FOR: YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ALBERTO MONZANO, SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/26/2017 OF YUCAIPA WESTWIND ESTATES, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/30/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ALBERTO MONZANO SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO SAMANTHA SEPOLVEDA SERVED ON 07/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $20.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,147.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170727-0839 $255.00; 170727-0839-CK Reference Number 59243

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.